Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Larson, Ivy C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Larson, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of Dismissal | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Bureau Of Vital Statistics Form Is Not Required | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Order SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM 121721 AT 9:30AM | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order RATIFYING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation PARTIES | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM 092921 AT 8:45AM | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management/Status Order CMC 092921 AT 8:45AM | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer BY PETITIONER IVY LARSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.