Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Watty, Cynthia, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Mcpherson, Scott Michael, against Elite Exterior Restoration Llc, Grace, James Louis, Justin L Murray Individually A, represented by Silver, Emily Kim, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with MANSFIELD, DECLAN P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMANSFIELD, DECLAN P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Cynthia Watty against Elite Exterior Restoration LLC and James Louis Grace. Cynthia Watty is seeking damages in excess of $30,000. The incident occurred on April 3, 2020, at the intersection of Main Street and Adams Street ...
Summons Issued And Returned To JUSTIN L MURRAY ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: January 20, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 11, 2021Response To Request Production FILED BY PLTF
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice PL | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate and/or Affidavit of Non Objections FILED BY PLTF | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit OF COMPLIANCE | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion TO QUASH DF | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement FILED BY PLTF | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non Party | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.