Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Caliber Home Loans Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anthousis, Julie, York, Julie, against Lafauce, Erik J, Lafauce, Karly J, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with GROGER, GREGORY G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROGER, GREGORY G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2019Verified Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Value Calculation for Real Property
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Report FILED BY CALIBER HOME LOANS INC | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Service ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO STAY FORECLOSURE ACTION SENT VIA US MAIL OR ELECTRONICALLY | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO STAY/ABATE FORECLOSURE ACTION AND TO EXTEND TIMELINES DUE TO COVID 19 | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Stay FILED BY PLTF | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication Notice of Action ON OR BEFORE 030620 | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence To Press For Publication BUSINESS OBSERVER 030620 | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Action By Publication ON OR BEFORE 040620 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.