Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daniella Elizabeth Margetic filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Isaac Jerome Logan, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with August A. Bonavita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugust A. Bonavita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS RECALLED ACCOUNT | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE ISSU | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $639.71 ON RECEIPT 4161396 $639.71 4161396 Fully Paid |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
D6 SUSPENSION CLEARED tblD6Event |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE RECALLED FROM COLLECTIONS | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE SENT TO COLLECTION AGENCY | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
D6 SUSPENSION REPORTED tblD6Event |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 SUSPENSION LETTER TO DFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.