Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brooke A Masterson, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner: MASTERSON, BROOKE A | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL S/B JUDGE BURTON ON 9/15/22 |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION IZ ORDER DIRECTING CLERK & COMPTROLLER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DIVISION "IZ" (OTIZ) GLENN D. KELLEY 07/29/2022 |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATUS ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE LAURIE ON JUNE 21, 2021 |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP F/B BROOKE MASTERSON |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING TITLE F/B BROOKE MASTERSON |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $251.50 ON RECEIPT 4062912 $251.50 4062912 Fully Paid |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING VEHICLE REGISTRATION F/B BROOKE MASTERSON |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISPO PERS PROPERTY W/O ADMIN F/B BROOKE A MASTERSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.