Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Laura Silver Mcguire, Linda Silver Bedell, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with KEEVER AGRAMA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKEEVER AGRAMA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION IA ORDER DIRECTING CLERK & COMPTROLLER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DIVISION "IA" (OTIA) GLENN D. KELLEY 07/25/2022 |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION/RELEASE OF CLAIM F/B U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOC |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM F/B U.S. NATIONAL ASSOC ATTY NOTIFIED |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING F/B ATTY LAVIE |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY - ESTATE F/B LAURA SILVER MCGUIRE |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS AND DEATH CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.