Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dominique Howard, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ducarmel Saint Louis, Weisser Kevin, against Typtap Insurance Company, represented by Christina Roye, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Scott R. Kerner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. Kerner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The plaintiff, Dominique Howard, is suing the defendant for damages exceeding $30,000. The complaint alleges that the defen...
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: August 25, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND DESIGNATION OF THIS CASE TO THE GENERAL TRACK AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING JUDGE S KERNER SIGNED 2-10-2022 |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S FIELD ADJIJSTER, BRAD HOLMES DOMINIQUE HOWARD 06/27/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) FOR 06/30/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY W/IN FIRM & DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY DUCARMEL SAINT LOUIS, ESQ. OBO PLTF |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT) |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE, FOR TYPTAP INS. CO. (F/B CHRISTINA ROYE ESQ. ,) |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4153993 $411.00 4153993 Fully Paid |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.