Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anthony Maisano, Lisa Maisano, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel M Ilani, against Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Bryan R Burkhardt, James K Rubin, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jaimie R. Goodman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaimie R. Goodman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Anthony and Lisa Maisano against Castle Key Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $30,000, excluding attorneys' fees, costs, and prejudgment interest. The plaintiffs reside in Palm Beach County,...
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 25, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 25, 2021REQUEST
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B PLT |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR MEDIATION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN GOODMAN DTD 02/02/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY AND THIS CASE IS DESIGNATED TO THE GENERAL TRACK FOR TIME TO DISPOSITION UNLESS ALL DFT(S) HAVE BEEN DEFAULTED AND/OR DROPPED. *** SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS *** |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINICIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY BUKHARDT OBO DFT |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INITAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B PLTS |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM DEFENDANT'S DESK ADJUSTER 01/12/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
December 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM DEFENDANT'S FIELD ADJUSTER JOHN AVILES 01/10/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
December 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE JOHN AVILES 1/10/22 10:00:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.