Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Starseed Ltd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ralph S Marcadis, against Blue Clover Financial Llc, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with G. Joseph Curley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeG. Joseph Curley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by STARSEED LTD against BLUE CLOVER FINANCIAL, LLC in the Circuit Court of the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The complaint alleges two counts: breach of agreement and unjust enrichment.
In Count I,...
DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER
Date: August 23, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33209 PAGE 364-364 CURLEY; PLTF RECOVER FROM DFT BLUE CLOVER FINANCIAL LLC $52,539.63 DTD 1/3/2022 |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DISPOSED BY JUDGE. F/B JUDGE CURLEY DTD 01/03/22 ***DOCKETED FROM CORRECTION QUEUE REPORT*** |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY DEFAULT DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS F/B GILBERT M. SINGER, ESQ |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT F/B PLT |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT PLT'S AFFIDAVIT AS TO CALCULATION OF INTEREST |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS F/B PLT |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S DEFAULT PLEADINGS@MARCADISLAW.COM BLUE CLOVER FINANCIAL, LLC |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BLUE CLOVER FINANCIAL LLC - 10/02/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.