Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Terrie Cooper, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gilbert R Arroyo, Grant A Grimes, Nestor A Ivanor, against Cypress Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Tyler Groelle, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with G. Joseph Curley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeG. Joseph Curley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Terrie Cooper against Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges damages greater than $30,000, exclusive of interest,...
COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 19, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B DFT |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION CYPRESS PROPERY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND DESIGNATION OF THIS CASE TO THE GENERAL TRACK JUDGE J CURLEY JR SIGNED 3-14-2022 |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER CURLEY DTD 3/8/22: DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION DENIED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT W/IN 20 DAYS CURLEY DTD 3/8/22: DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLT'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION DENIED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT W/IN 20 DAYS |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTITFFS COMPLAINT F/B DFT |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 2/15/22 08:30:00 AM | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION FILED BY ATTY ARROYO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.