Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maitee Brizuela, Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Other Circuit case represented by Richard Thomas Petitt, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2014 |
CategoryOther Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
APPLICATION
Date: June 02, 2014NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 12, 2014NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 13, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY RICHARD T PETITT ESQ |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PETITIONER Filed by PETITIONER PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT Filed by PETITIONER MAITEE BRIZUELA |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET F/B ATTY OBO PLT Filed by PETITIONER MAITEE BRIZUELA |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION AUGUST 13, 2014 @ 8:30 A.M Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD THOMAS PETITT |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS PURSUANT TO SECTION 626.9926 FLORIDA STATUTES F/B PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC Filed by PETITIONER PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS AND NOTICE OF HEARING 8-13-14 @ 8:30 AM F/B PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC Filed by PETITIONER PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$401.00 was made on receipt CAMB899185. Filed by PETITIONER PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS PURSUANT TO SECTION F/B PLT Filed by PETITIONER PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.