Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James D Holman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee Edward Levenson, against 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company, Ariel Gevurtz, Gary S Gevurtz, represented by Sunita A Trelles, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE 21 ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INIS CO - OF INTERGS Filed by DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY Filed by DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES F/B DFT 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INS CO - AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Filed by DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE 21 ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY (FIRST) Filed by DEFENDANT 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE BEEKHARRY, SUNITA A Filed By ATTORNEY SUNITA A TRELLES |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED ON GARY GEVURTZ ON 7/28/13 Filed by DEFENDANT GARY S GEVURTZ |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED 7/28/2013 GARY GEVURTZ (ORIGINAL SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED) Filed by DEFENDANT GARY S GEVURTZ |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SUMMONS SERVED ON ARIEL GEVURTZ BY SERVING GARY GERURTZ |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL F/B JAMES HLMAN NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF JAMES D HOLMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.