Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rodriguez-Alvarado, Rafael, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED AENLWOE
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED CASE DISMISSED-PURSUANT TO PLEA **********************CASE CLOSED********************** | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAPOT WAIVED $2.00 | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMCC WAIVED $71.35 | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMFN WAIVED $30.00 | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMSC WAIVED $12.65 | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 11/04/2021 AT 8:05 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 10/14/2021 AT 8:05 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 09/30/2021 AT 8:05 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.