Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Perez, Ivis T, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.6122.905. / 2022001852)
Date: December 30, 2021ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 9/10/2021 PARTY SERVED: IVIS T. PEREZ
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.6122.905. / 2022001852) | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 9/10/2021 PARTY SERVED: IVIS T. PEREZ | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL SET FOR 09/24/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021078177 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 004623 SP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.