Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fernandez Montes De Oca, Irenardo Dionni, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
This complaint charges Irenardo Dionni Fernandez Montes de with petit theft, a misdemeanor of the second degree. The complaint alleges that on or about May 20, 2021, in Osceola County, Florida, Irenardo Dionni Fernandez Montes de knowingly obtained o...
WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: February 16, 2022CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM
Date: September 01, 2021SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED
Date: September 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED - FAILED TO PAY $396.00 | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED - AMENDED | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | STATE AMENDS NAME TO : IRENARDO DIONNI FERNANDEZ MONTES DE OCA 1. YOU SHALL BE INCARCERATED IN THE OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL FOR A PERIOD OF 18 DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR 18 DAYS. * TO PAY COURT COSTS (FINE NOT INCLUDED) OF $271.00 * TO PAY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE OF $50.00 * TO PAY COST OF DEFENSE OF $50.00 (X) PAY AT A RATE OF $25.00 PER MONTH * YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PROGRAM LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO PAY YOUR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS OR MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE. IF A DEFENDANT IS SENTENCED TO A PERIOD OF CONFINEMENT AND IS SUBJECT TO AN IMMIGRATION DETAINER, THE SENTENCE MAY BE REDUCED BY A PERIOD OF NOT MORE THAN TWELVE DAYS ON THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS' DETERMINATION THAT THE REDUCTION IN SENTENCE WILL FACILITATE TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT INTO FEDERAL CUSTODY. (X) NO RETURN TO WALMART 4444 W VINE STREET | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.