Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Forti Lus, Mcarthur, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: October 13, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: August 12, 2021INFORMATION FILED
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | 1. YOU SHALL BE INCARCERATED IN THE OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL FOR A PERIOD OF 73 DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR 73 DAYS AS TO COUNT 1 AND 60 DAYS WTH CREDIT FOR 73 DAYS AS TO COUNT 2; COUNTS TO RUN CONCURRENT * TO PAY COURT COSTS (FINE NOT INCLUDED) OF $273.00 * TO PAY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE OF $50.00 * TO PAY COST OF DEFENSE OF $50.00 * DO NOT RETURN TO: AMBASSADOR INN, 4107 W. VINE ST, KISSIMMEE FL YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE. IF A DEFENDANT IS SENTENCED TO A PERIOD OF CONFINEMENT AND IS SUBJECT TO AN IMMIGRATION DETAINER, THE SENTENCE MAY BE REDUCED BY A PERIOD OF NOT MORE THAN TWELVE DAYS ON THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS' DETERMINATION THAT THE REDUCTION IN SENTENCE WILL FACILITATE TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT INTO FEDERAL CUSTODY. | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | 73 DAYS IC (AS OF 10/13/21) | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEFENDER PRETRIAL SET FOR 10/13/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.