Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mock, Larry Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: December 27, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST
Date: October 14, 2021COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS
Date: March 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED - FAILED TO PAY $396.00 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.