Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lyew, Demoy Dwight, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY
Date: December 29, 2021COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION
Date: September 20, 2021COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE
Date: September 20, 2021COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT
Date: September 20, 2021CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE
Date: August 30, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: September 10, 2021ORIGINAL TRAFFIC CITATION FILED
Date: September 03, 2021CITATION FILED A17LVEP
Date: August 30, 20219/20/2021
Date: April 03, 20249/20/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/10/2021
Date: April 02, 20249/3/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/30/2021
Date: April 04, 202411/29/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/30/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED - FAILED TO PAY $398.00 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.