Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cox, Dustin George, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
DISCOVERY NOTICE OF BODY WORN CAMERA FOOTAGE SENT TO DEFENSE
Date: October 11, 2021ORIGINAL TRAFFIC CITATION FILED
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00 | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00 | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ENCOMPASSED INTO: 2021 CF 002403 | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.