Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Plante, Troy Martin, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST
Date: October 08, 2021ORIGINAL TRAFFIC CITATION FILED
Date: August 25, 2021FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | 1. YOU SHALL BE INCARCERATED IN THE OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL FOR A PERIOD OF 56 DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR 56 DAYS. * TO PAY COURT COSTS (FINE NOT INCLUDED) OF $273.00 * TO PAY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE OF $50.00 * TO PAY COST OF DEFENSE OF $50.00 YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE. IF A DEFENDANT IS SENTENCED TO A PERIOD OF CONFINEMENT AND IS SUBJECT TO AN IMMIGRATION DETAINER, THE SENTENCE MAY BE REDUCED BY A PERIOD OF NOT MORE THAN TWELVE DAYS ON THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS' DETERMINATION THAT THE REDUCTION IN SENTENCE WILL FACILITATE TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT INTO FEDERAL CUSTODY. | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | 56 DAYS IC (AS OF 10/13/21) | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.