Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Guarchaj, Pedro Tzep, Tzep-Guarchaj, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PRETRIAL STATUS SHEET
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: October 15, 2021CASH BOND 2031104 A POSTED $1,000.00
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.