Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Capellan De Castro, Marcia Miguelina, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED A3LIRSP
Date: August 12, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: August 16, 20218/12/2021
Date: November 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI: | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STATE ANNOUNCED NOLLE PROSEQUI IN OPEN COURT | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT AT 2:30PM PLEASE DISREGARD PREVIOUS NOTICE | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/08/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/08/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.