Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garcia, Michel, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED A3LIO4P
Date: August 12, 2021PAYMENT $373.00 RECEIPT #2021093048
Date: October 19, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $373.00 RECEIPT #2021093048 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCED TO PROBATION - RECORDED (OR.6039.1161. / 2021139555) | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.