Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mercado, Melanie Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
1/21/2022
Date: December 02, 202310/25/2021
Date: December 01, 20238/23/2021
Date: December 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.