Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
County Attorney, filed a(n) County Ordinance case against Davis, Alicia Lasean, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Ordinance |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION NOTICE | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | 56 DAYS | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.