Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Simon, Anton, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Garcia, Tomas Estiven Betancur, Government Employees Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Anton Simon against Tomas Estiven Betancur Garcia and Government Employees Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $30,000. The ...
PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2021093740
Date: October 21, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2021DEFENDANT TOMAS ESTIVEN BETANCUR GARCIA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJEDICE AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS ESTIVEN BETANCUR GARCIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.