Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Berverena, Sally, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sally Berverena against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks declaratory relief. The damages claimed by the plaintiff are greater than $30,000. The plainti...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 08, 20219/8/2021
Date: January 15, 2073Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2073 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, INJUNCTION, AND AUTOMATICESTAY AS TO SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.