Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Duenas, Ari, Ortiz, Jose, Vargas, Andrew J., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Jose L. Ortiz and Ari Duenas against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, and the policy was in effect when their property lo...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.