Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tessier, Doris, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 08, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER
Date: September 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFEDNANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ITS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF DORIS TESSIER | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT COVER PAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.