Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lee, Sarah Jane, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Nhccom Llc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
This complaint is a class action filed by Sarah Jane Lee against NHC.com, LLC, alleging violations of the Florida Telephone Solicitation Act (FTSA). The plaintiff claims that the defendant, an online retailer of natural health products, engaged in te...
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER
Date: September 09, 2021GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: September 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.