Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abreu, Sylvia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against People'S Trust Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 1985 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sylvia Abreu against People's Trust Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract for damages over $30,000. The plai...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 01, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER
Date: September 09, 20219/1/2021
Date: January 15, 1985Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANYS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
November 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANYS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.