Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gs Investments Usa Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a petition for declaratory relief filed by GS Investments USA LLC against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of Osceola County, Florida. The petitioner is seeking a determination of insurance coverage ...
PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: August 31, 20218/31/2021
Date: January 27, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING REMOTE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING REMOTE DEPOSITION | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.