Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Nales, Doreen, Navarro, Jose I, Navarro, Luz, Orellano Navarro, Damarys, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Getwell Transportation, Inc., Otero, Eva Rosalie, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 1988 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.