Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bedoya, Liz, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Clear Blue Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a petition for declaratory relief filed by Liz Bedoya against Clear Blue Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of Osceola County, Florida. The petitioner seeks a determination of insurance coverage and the parties' contractual righ...
PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: August 20, 20218/20/2021
Date: January 25, 20248/20/2021
Date: January 03, 2024STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.