Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia, Angel Jesse, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Angel Jesse Garcia against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that on June 19, 2020, Garcia was involved in a motor vehicle accident in Osceola County, Florida. The accident occurred when Ca...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 19, 20218/19/2021
Date: January 10, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINITFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF (03/22/23 CME WITH RANDALL T RUST) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.