Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Scott, Sandra, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Florida Insurance Guaranty Association, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2052 | Docket Event | ||
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.