Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lubin, Frantz Guito, Pierre, Bergeline, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Progressive Home Dba Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Frantz Guito Lubin and Bergeline Pierre against Progressive Home, also known as ASI Preferred Insurance Corp. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by the defendant. The action seeks damages exceeding $30,000, excluding ...
COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.