Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sukhoo, Teeram, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doe, John, Lm General Insurance Company, Mercury Indemnity Company Of America, Testa, Chrystal, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Teeram Sukhoo against John Doe, Chrystal Testa, and Mercury Indemnity Company of America. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages exceeding $30,000. Teeram Sukhoo claims that on May 20, 2016, John Doe negligently...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2061 | Docket Event | ||
January 15, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.