Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estate Of Arthur B. Strauss, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff, the Estate of Arthur Strauss, is suing the defendant, American Integrity Insurance Company, for damages in excess of $30,000. The pl...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 12, 20218/12/2021
Date: January 02, 202410/4/2021
Date: January 02, 202410/28/2021
Date: January 03, 2024DEFENDANT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.