Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Osorio, Martha, Osorio, Misael, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.