Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robin Bastin As Power Of Attorney For Patricia Seals, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case against Florida Facilities Llc, Gulf Coast Health Care Of Delaware Llc D B A Gulf Coast Health Care Llc, Sf Kissimmee Llc D B A Oaks Of Kissimmee Health And Rehabilitation Center, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
This complaint is filed by Robin Bastin, acting as Power of Attorney for Patricia Seals, against SF Kissimmee, LLC d/b/a Oaks of Kissimmee Health and Rehabilitation Center, Gulf Coast Health Care of Delaware, LLC d/b/a Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, an...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2047 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.