Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leon, Jorge, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Publix Super Markets, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.