Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Oquendo, Elvis Michael, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
5/21/2021
Date: December 02, 20231/20/2021
Date: December 01, 202311/12/2020
Date: December 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED DEPUTY PAUL SPEARS | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL INFRACTION HEARINGS SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ENTRY OF PLEA, DEMAND FOR HEARING BEFORE COUNTY JUDGE | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 11/05/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 TR 044219 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.