Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ortiz-Colon, Erika Jazmin, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WOOTEN, WAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWOOTEN, WAYNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: December 29, 2021ACCEPTED INTO THE PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION PROGRAM
Date: July 29, 2021PRETRIAL INTERVENTION AGREEMENT
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.