Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Negron, Sean Carlos, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARSTEN, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: October 04, 2021NOTIFICATION OF PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION REJECTION
Date: August 31, 2021CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: May 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.