Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Calderon-Perez, Carlos Juan, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WISH, CARLY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWISH, CARLY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
This complaint charges Carlos Juan Calderon-Perez with grand theft. It alleges that on or about October 23, 2020, in Osceola County, Florida, Calderon-Perez knowingly obtained or used a paint sprayer valued at $100 or more but less than $750 from the...
PAYMENT $265.90 RECEIPT #2021105257
Date: November 29, 2021PAYMENT $267.79 RECEIPT #2022009016
Date: January 31, 2022PAYMENT $4.12 RECEIPT #2022053153
Date: June 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.