Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lee, Shenita Gavanda, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WILSON, TANYA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILSON, TANYA DAVIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CHECK REQUEST FORM
Date: October 18, 2022DEMAND FOR SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: November 18, 2022PAYMENT $150.00 RECEIPT #2021072322
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.