Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hammond, Lonnie Harold, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: January 25, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY
Date: December 23, 2020CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: January 25, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: November 17, 2020INFORMATION
Date: November 16, 2020PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER
Date: October 14, 2020CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE
Date: October 09, 2020OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM
Date: October 23, 20201/26/2021
Date: April 05, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/21/2020
Date: April 02, 202412/23/2020
Date: April 05, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 04, 202411/17/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/23/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/22/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/9/2020
Date: April 04, 202412/7/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/14/2020
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.