Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Oskierko, Charles E, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022099540
Date: October 27, 2022PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022098506
Date: October 26, 2022PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022064758
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022099540 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022098506 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022073913 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022064758 | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022043080 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022023040 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2022002981 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2021108767 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $188.81 RECEIPT #2021101809 | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.73 RECEIPT #2021084352 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.