Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Thomas Joniel, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MORGAN, JON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, JON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: September 20, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: September 20, 2021ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.